This topic contains 0 replies, has 0 voices, and was last updated by  EduGorilla 1 year, 11 months ago.

  • Author
    Posts
  • #902627 Reply
     EduGorilla 
    Keymaster

    If 34 × 15 = 495 and 43 × 12 = 504, then 98 × 17 = ? 
    यदि 34 × 15 = 495 और 43 × 12 = 504, तो 98 × 17 = ? 

    Options :-

    1. 1649 

    2. 1683 

    3. 1763 

    4. 1751 

    Post your Training /Course Enquiry
    Are You looking institutes / coaching center for
    • IIT-JEE, NEET, CAT
    • Bank PO, SSC, Railways
    • Study Abroad
    Select your Training / Study category
Reply To: If 34 × 15 = 495 and 43 × 12 = 504, then 98 × 17 = ? यदि 34 × 15 = 495 और 43 × 1….
Your information:




GET UPTO 50%    OFF!
Verify Yourself




Log in with your credentials

or    

Forgot your details?

Create Account